+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Commerce
- Introduced by Senators Lassa, Carpenter, C. Larson, Vinehout, L. Taylor and Shilling; cosponsored by Representatives Barca, Shankland, Milroy, Sargent, Goyke, Spreitzer, Berceau, Brostoff, C. Taylor, Ohnstad, Jorgensen, Considine, Subeck, Wachs, Kolste, Hebl, Zamarripa, Pope, Sinicki and Johnson
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor