+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Senate Substitute Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
- Read a second time
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Ballweg
On December 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Conley added as a cosponsor
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On September 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications
- Introduced by Senators Ballweg, Cowles, Petrowski, Pfaff and Wanggaard; cosponsored by Representatives Oldenburg, Plumer, Cabral-Guevara, Considine, Gundrum, Krug, Rozar, Snyder, Spiros, Tauchen, Tittl and VanderMeer
+ − Amendments (3)
2021 SSA2-SB468
- Relating to: changing the phase-out of utility aid payments for decommissioned power plants.
2021 SSA1-SB468
- Relating to: changing the phase-out of utility aid payments for decommissioned power plants.
+ − Vote
March 8, 2022: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor