+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Published 3-2-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 234
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 87, Noes 8
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 2:28 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Representative Ohnstad withdrawn as a cosponsor
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski, Harris Dodd, Hansen, Lasee, Ringhand and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Spiros, Mason, Ballweg, Berceau, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Horlacher, Johnson, Kahl, Kolste, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Ohnstad, A. Ott, Pope, Riemer, Ripp, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Young and Subeck
+ − Vote
February 18, 2016: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor