+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Published 4-27-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-26-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 387
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 56, Noes 37, Paired 4
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 4 offered by Senator Hansen
- Read a second time
- Senate Substitute Amendment 3 adopted
- Senate Substitute Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 12
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
- Made a special order of business at 2:27 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 1
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Available for scheduling
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Senator Cowles
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Lasee
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Lasee, Nass, LeMahieu, Stroebel and Kapenga; cosponsored by Representatives Jarchow, Nygren, Knodl, Tittl, Hutton, Craig, Allen, Czaja and Petersen
+ − Amendments (4)
2015 SSA4-SB459
- Relating to: shoreline maintenance activities in certain areas of the bay of Green Bay.
2015 SSA3-SB459
- Relating to: the regulation of navigable waters and wetlands.
2015 SSA2-SB459
- Relating to: the regulation of navigable waters and wetlands.
2015 SSA1-SB459
- Relating to: the regulation of navigable waters and wetlands.
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2016: Read a third time and concurred in, Paired 4
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 37
February 16, 2016: Senate Substitute Amendment 4 laid on table
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 12
February 16, 2016: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor