+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Kapenga, Stroebel, Craig, Nass and Wanggaard; cosponsored by Representatives Horlacher, Kremer, Jacque, August, Born, Brandtjen, R. Brooks, Duchow, Gannon, Hutton, Jarchow, Katsma, Kerkman, Knodl, Kooyenga, Kuglitsch, Murphy, Neylon, Rodriguez, Sanfelippo, Skowronski and Weatherston
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor