+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Published 4-9-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 259
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Senator Miller added as a coauthor
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
- Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Erpenbach added as a coauthor
On January 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Housing
- Introduced by Senators Olsen, Harsdorf, Schultz, Grothman, Lehman and Lassa; cosponsored by Representatives Knudson, Kooyenga, Murphy, Steineke, Stroebel, Czaja, Ohnstad, Kahl and Nass
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor