+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Published 2-5-2022
- Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 125
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-1-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
On January 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On December 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Health
On October 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On October 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Senators Testin and Kooyenga; cosponsored by Representatives Summerfield, James, Cabral-Guevara, Dittrich, Rozar and Wichgers
+ − Amendment
2021 SSA1-SB453
- Relating to: modifying an administrative rule to eliminate prior authorization for enteral products administered through a tube.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor