+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On August 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Agard, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Johnson, Larson, Roys, Smith and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Snodgrass, Cabrera, Neubauer, Spreitzer, Anderson, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Emerson, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hong, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Stubbs and Vining
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor