+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 0
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Zepnick added as a cosponsor
On October 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Olsen, Marklein, Bewley and Feyen; cosponsored by Representatives Swearingen, R. Brooks, Spreitzer, Considine, Mursau, Meyers, Vruwink, E. Brooks, Steffen, Genrich, Shankland and Nygren
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor