+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, LeMahieu, Ringhand, Vinehout and Wirch; cosponsored by Representatives Novak, Anderson, Ballweg, E. Brooks, R. Brooks, Crowley, Edming, Horlacher, Kitchens, Krug, Kulp, Mursau, Nerison, Petryk, Riemer, Ripp, Skowronski, Tittl, Tranel and Tusler
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor