+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Published 3-2-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 248
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
- Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry
- Introduced by Senators Tiffany and Moulton; cosponsored by Representatives E. Brooks, Czaja, Kremer, Tittl, Milroy, Kooyenga, Jarchow and Horlacher
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor