+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions, and Rural Issues
- Introduced by Senator Gudex; cosponsored by Representatives Born, Jacque, A. Ott, Kulp, E. Brooks, Horlacher, Rohrkaste, R. Brooks, Hintz, Kremer, Tittl and Petryk
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor