+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Published 4-4-2018
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 244
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 2:04 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Cowles added as a coauthor
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Available for scheduling
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Zepnick added as a cosponsor
On October 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Testin, Olsen, Feyen, Harsdorf and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Quinn, Spiros, Ballweg, Brandtjen, E. Brooks, R. Brooks, Brostoff, Edming, Felzkowski, Hutton, Jagler, Kremer, Krug, Mursau, Steffen, Subeck, Swearingen, Thiesfeldt and Tusler
+ − Amendments (2)
2017 SSA1-SB415
- Relating to: reporting on an operator license or identification card or vehicle registration application the existence of a disability that is not immediately apparent to another.
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor