+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Tiffany, Moulton, Olsen, LeMahieu, Marklein and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Kleefisch, Ballweg, Edming, Gannon, Felzkowski, Horlacher, Jarchow, Katsma, Milroy, Mursau, Ripp, Tusler, Thiesfeldt and E. Brooks
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor