+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Wanggaard
On October 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wanggaard
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
- Introduced by Senators Wanggaard, Stroebel, Nass and Kapenga; cosponsored by Representatives Hutton, Tusler, Allen, Ballweg, Gannon, Horlacher, Jarchow, Kuglitsch, Murphy, Quinn, Rohrkaste and Spiros
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor