+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Published 11-14-2019
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-13-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 21
On November 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-11-2019
On October 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On October 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 4
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
- Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules
On October 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade
- Introduced by Senators Olsen and Marklein; cosponsored by Representatives Ballweg, Kurtz and Tusler
+ − Vote
October 8, 2019: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4