+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On December 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
On November 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Smith, Bernier and Pfaff; cosponsored by Representatives James, Shankland, Novak, Summerfield, Hebl, Tittl, Shelton, Callahan, Subeck, Conley, Considine, Spreitzer, Moses, Baldeh and Stubbs
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor