+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On November 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski, Fitzgerald, Olsen, Testin and Tiffany; cosponsored by Representatives Edming, Gannon, Jarchow, Kremer, Krug, Milroy, Mursau, Ripp, Schraa and Tauchen
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor