+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
On November 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced by Senators Olsen, Harris and Risser; cosponsored by Representatives Ballweg, Bernier, Bewley, Bies, Brooks, Danou, Hebl, Jagler, LeMahieu, Murphy, A. Ott, Pasch, Sanfelippo, Severson, Steineke and Wachs
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor