+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Risser, Wanggaard, Johnson, Olsen and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Tusler, Stuck, Anderson, Ballweg, Brandtjen, Berceau, Brostoff, Considine, Fields, Genrich, Jacque, Kulp, Milroy, Mursau, Spiros, Spreitzer, Subeck and Zepnick
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor