+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Published 12-4-2021
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 103
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
- LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On October 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Rules suspended
On October 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-20-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- LRB correction
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski, Felzkowski, Ballweg, Bewley, Cowles, Erpenbach, Feyen, Jacque, Pfaff, Ringhand, Stroebel, Testin and Wirch; cosponsored by Representatives Swearingen, Mursau, Callahan, Edming, Hesselbein, Kitchens, Kurtz, B. Meyers, Milroy, Moses, Novak, Oldenburg, Rozar, Spiros, Summerfield, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, VanderMeer, Zimmerman and Spreitzer
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor