+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Published 11-23-2019
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-22-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 54
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3)
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On November 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On November 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
On November 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 4
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On September 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, Kooyenga, Smith, Craig, Feyen, Kapenga, Nass, Olsen, Ringhand, Stroebel, L. Taylor and Wanggaard; cosponsored by Representatives Katsma, Macco, Riemer, Bowen, Brandtjen, Brostoff, Dittrich, Duchow, Edming, Gundrum, Kuglitsch, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Murphy, Neylon, Ohnstad, Ramthun, Spiros, C. Taylor, Wittke and Zimmerman
+ − Vote
October 8, 2019: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor