+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining, and Forestry
- Introduced by Senator Tiffany; cosponsored by Representative Swearingen
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor