+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senator Tiffany; cosponsored by Representatives Swearingen, Kleefisch, R. Brooks, Ballweg, Krug, Mursau and Czaja
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor