+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On September 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Born added as a cosponsor
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Department of Transportation Revocation report received pursuant to s.13.0965, Wisconsin Statutes
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Jacque and Bewley; cosponsored by Representatives Spiros, Horlacher, James, Kulp, L. Myers, Ramthun, Stubbs and Tusler
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor