+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 102
- Published 12-4-2021
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On October 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On October 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On July 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Conley added as a cosponsor
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
- Introduced by Senators Ballweg, Smith and Jacque; cosponsored by Representatives Petryk, Dallman, Spreitzer, Armstrong, Bowen, Edming, Gundrum, Mursau, Rozar, Snodgrass, Tittl, VanderMeer, Murphy and James
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor