+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Published 2-27-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 2-26-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 153
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
On February 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On December 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
- Read a second time
On October 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Moulton added as a coauthor
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Representative Heaton added as a cosponsor
On October 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced by Senators Vukmir, Bewley, Cowles, Darling, Erpenbach, Gudex, Hansen, Harris Dodd, Harsdorf, C. Larson, Lassa, Miller, Olsen, Petrowski, Ringhand, Shilling, Vinehout, Wanggaard and Wirch; cosponsored by Representatives Czaja, Kolste, Ballweg, Berceau, Bernier, Billings, Born, E. Brooks, Considine, Edming, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Jagler, Jorgensen, Kahl, Kitchens, Kleefisch, Knodl, Krug, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Meyers, Milroy, Mursau, Nerison, Novak, Nygren, Ohnstad, A. Ott, Petryk, Riemer, Ripp, Rodriguez, Rohrkaste, Sanfelippo, Sargent, Schraa, Shankland, Sinicki, Skowronski, Spreitzer, Steffen, Stuck, Subeck, Swearingen, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, VanderMeer and Vorpagel
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2016: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 98
October 20, 2015: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor