+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues
- Introduced by Senators Agard, L. Taylor, Kooyenga, Larson, Smith, Wirch, Erpenbach, Carpenter, Johnson and Bewley; cosponsored by Representatives Hesselbein, Cabral-Guevara, Snodgrass, Milroy, S. Rodriguez, Hebl, Pope, Emerson, Neubauer, Shelton, Hong, Anderson, Andraca, Vruwink, Bowen, Tusler, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Skowronski, Sinicki, Cabrera, Subeck, Drake, Ohnstad, Conley, Shankland and Billings
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor