+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Vinehout withdrawn as a coauthor
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cowles and Wanggaard
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On July 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Pronschinske added as a cosponsor
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Stroebel, Vinehout, Kapenga, Petrowski, Olsen and Darling; cosponsored by Representatives Horlacher, R. Brooks, Tusler, Kitchens, Skowronski, Hutton, Macco, Novak, Kulp, Kleefisch, Petryk, Krug, Ripp, Doyle, Jacque, Edming, Murphy and Vruwink
+ − Amendment
2017 SSA1-SB280
- Relating to: neglect of a child and providing criminal penalties.
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor