+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Allen withdrawn as a cosponsor
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Edming added as a cosponsor
On August 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter and Kapenga
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced by Senators Kapenga, Darling, Tiffany, Bernier, Craig, Kooyenga, Nass and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Sanfelippo, Brooks, Dittrich, Duchow, Felzkowski, Gundrum, Horlacher, Hutton, Jagler, Katsma, Kitchens, Knodl, Kuglitsch, Kulp, Loudenbeck, Murphy, Novak, Petersen, Plumer, Quinn, Ramthun, Rohrkaste, Skowronski, Sortwell, Spiros, Stafsholt, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Tusler, VanderMeer, Vorpagel and Wichgers
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor