+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Published 3-1-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 185
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules
On December 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On November 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges
- Introduced by Senators Harsdorf, Marklein, Vinehout, Bewley, Nass and Cowles; cosponsored by Representatives Murphy, Krug, Skowronski, T. Larson, E. Brooks, Ballweg, Novak, Knodl, A. Ott, Allen, Thiesfeldt, Rohrkaste and Steffen
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor