+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published 8-3-2017
- Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 56
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
- Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Marklein and Erpenbach; cosponsored by Representatives Novak, E. Brooks and Considine