+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Miller
On September 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Elections and Urban Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Lazich, Leibham, Vukmir and Darling; cosponsored by Representatives Bernier, Strachota, T. Larson, Sanfelippo, Tittl, Bies, Knodl and Murphy
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Miller
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor