+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 218
- Published 4-9-2014
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 10:25 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On September 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski
On August 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski and Grothman; cosponsored by Representatives Sanfelippo, Ripp, Bies and Schraa
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor