+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-8-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 130
- Published 12-9-2017
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-5-2017
On November 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On November 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
On November 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
On October 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On September 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
On August 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Senators Olsen, Darling, C. Larson and Marklein; cosponsored by Representatives Duchow, Considine, Jacque, Pope, Ripp, Sargent and Subeck
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor