+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 165
- Published 3-1-2016
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 2:18 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senator Marklein; cosponsored by Representatives Tranel, E. Brooks, Rohrkaste, Subeck, Allen, A. Ott and Spreitzer
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor