+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Published 8-7-2021
- Report approved by the Governor on 8-6-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 79
On August 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 8-5-2021
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- LRB correction
- Report correctly enrolled
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Ordered to a third reading
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules
On June 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to joint committee on Finance
- Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Rules suspended
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cowles and Smith
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Smith, Agard and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Mursau, Gundrum, Novak, Oldenburg, Skowronski, Subeck, Thiesfeldt, Hebl and Spreitzer
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 11, 2021: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor