+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 170
- Published 3-29-2018
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2018
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules
On November 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On October 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski, Cowles and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Schraa, R. Brooks and Petryk