+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Schachtner added as a coauthor
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Jacque, Risser, Carpenter, Smith, Bewley, Larson and Ringhand; cosponsored by Representatives Kolste, Mursau, Quinn, Oldenburg, Sinicki, Milroy, Goyke, Billings, Ohnstad, Considine, Crowley, Subeck, Hesselbein, Anderson, Zamarripa, Rodriguez, Skowronski, Pope, Stubbs and Neubauer
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor