+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Considine added as a cosponsor
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues
- Introduced by Senators Bernier, Miller, Smith, Bewley and Schachtner; cosponsored by Representatives Tusler, Zamarripa, Spreitzer, Anderson, Krug, Loudenbeck, Macco, Mursau, Ramthun, Vruwink and Subeck
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor