+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Jacque and Marklein; cosponsored by Representatives Tittl, James, Dittrich, Moses, Murphy, Mursau, Rozar, Skowronski and Wichgers
+ − Amendments (2)
2021 SSA2-SB239
- Relating to: excluding time for evaluation and treatment of certain medical conditions from the time limit for emergency detention without a hearing.
2021 SSA1-SB239
- Relating to: approval of emergency detention after evaluation of certain medical conditions.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor