+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On December 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Education
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative James added as a cosponsor
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Senators Jacque, Ballweg and L. Taylor; cosponsored by Representatives Krug, Mursau, Cabral-Guevara, Callahan, Horlacher, Knodl, Ramthun, Rozar, Snyder, Spreitzer and Subeck
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor