+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Published 4-1-2022
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-31-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 212
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2022
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action ordered immediately messaged
- Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in as amended
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Skowronski
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules
On December 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Senators Bradley and Nass; cosponsored by Representatives Skowronski, Brandtjen, Edming, Horlacher, James, Moses, Ramthun, Sanfelippo, Schraa and Wichgers
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor