+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Senators Stroebel and Nass; cosponsored by Representatives Thiesfeldt, Hutton, Kulp, Kremer, R. Brooks, Tusler and Gannon
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor