+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Genrich added as a cosponsor
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor
On September 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wirch
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
On August 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Barca added as a cosponsor
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Wirch, Lassa and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Ohnstad, Kerkman, Sinicki, Stuck, Steffen, Milroy, Berceau, Hesselbein, Jorgensen, Bowen, Kolste, Kahl, Spiros, Zepnick, Subeck, Quinn, Pope and Thiesfeldt
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor