+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Published 4-4-2018
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 246
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules
On November 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
On October 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
On October 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Wanggaard and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Hutton, E. Brooks, R. Brooks, Kitchens, Kooyenga, Kremer, Sanfelippo, Spiros and Thiesfeldt
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor