+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Health
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Available for scheduling
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced by Senators Testin, L. Taylor, Carpenter, Kooyenga and Ringhand; cosponsored by Representatives Novak, Swearingen, Armstrong, Bowen, Callahan, Kitchens, Krug, Moses, L. Myers, J. Rodriguez, Rozar, Skowronski and Stubbs
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor