+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Published 4-9-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 262
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 10:24 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman
- Read a second time
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On September 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs
- Introduced by Senator Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Swearingen, Kleefisch, Born, Mursau, Brooks, Ballweg, A. Ott, Bernier, Czaja, Schraa, Tittl and Jacque
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Vote
March 11, 2014: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor