+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues
- Introduced by Senators Bernier, Hansen, Kooyenga, Larson, L. Taylor and Wirch; cosponsored by Representatives Thiesfeldt, C. Taylor, Ballweg, Anderson, Considine, Edming, Gruszynski, Kolste, Kulp, Mursau, Pope, Ramthun, Rohrkaste, Sargent, Shankland, Spiros, Spreitzer, Subeck, Skowronski and Sinicki
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor