+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published 12-1-2017
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 85
On November 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017
On November 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Barca added as a cosponsor
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On November 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski, Cowles, Marklein and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Spiros, Ripp, Krug, Kulp and Mursau
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor